Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vang, Nhia, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Limited case represented by Pro Per, against Lee, Yer, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 1998 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: INTENT TO DISMISS ON COURT'S MOTION Notice Date: 2015-03-10 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 331 - DISMISSED Disp Clerk: KLD Filing Clerk: SLG Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: INTENT TO DISMISS ON COURT'S MOTION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
December 16, 1999 | Docket Event | Personal | |
December 16, 1999 | Docket Event |
Legacy Service Information Name: LEE, YER PartyId: 122641_2_200_2 Service Type: PER Summons Date: 1999-12-16 00:00:00.0000000 |
|
June 21, 1999 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE SUMM/CMPLNT AS TO YER LEE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: FRG | |
January 20, 1999 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees APP FOR ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DEF: YER LEE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: VRW |
|
January 20, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver ORDER RE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS GRANTED TO DEF: YER LEE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: VRW |
|
January 20, 1999 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF DEF: YER LEE Fee Type: W1 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 185.00 Entry Clerk: VRW 40 - $0.00 98 - $0.00 37 - $23.00 46 - $3.00 11 - $3.00 36 - $3.00 277 - $135.00 10 - $18.00 | |
January 12, 1999 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS,COMPLT TO DEF: LEE **SUB SRVC NO DEC OF DILIGENCE** Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: VRW | |
December 15, 1998 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed SUMMONS RETURNED & FILED NO POS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: VRW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.