Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fulcher, Malcom, Fulcher, Rebecca, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Webb, Paris Richard, against Universal Property And Casual, represented by Brannon, Paul David, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
COMPLAINT PARIS@INSURANCELAWYERS.ORG
Date: December 30, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED FOR UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 30, 2019COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT (AMENDED) PARIS@INSURANCELAWYERS.ORG
Date: February 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 3/31/2022 at 1100 AM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM PURSUANT TO RULE 1.310(B)(6) | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS VIA ZOOM-MALCOM FULCHER & REBECCA FULCHER | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR'S REPORT-NO AGREEMENT WAS REACHED | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND MOTION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.