Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Loandepotcom Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cournoyer, Derek Raymond, against In Possession Of The Property,, Stokes, Dennis Stanley, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 22, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT SERVICEFL@MLG-DEFAULTLAW.COM
Date: November 22, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: December 11, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE - DENNIS STANLEY STOKES
Date: December 23, 2019RESPONSE FROM BELVA VAUGHN STOKES
Date: December 30, 2019PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT-DID NOT ISSUE-RESPONSE WAS FILED
Date: November 18, 2021NOTICE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: December 08, 2021STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: December 09, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED
Date: January 28, 2022BIDDER SHEET
Date: March 09, 2022THIRD PARTY BIDDER INFORMATION SHEET
Date: March 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: March 09, 2022TRUST DISBURSEMENT REQUEST AND COPY OF CHECK
Date: March 10, 2022LETTER IN REFERENCE TO SURPLUS FUNDS
Date: March 10, 2022CORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTORNEY
Date: March 18, 2022RECORDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: March 21, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: March 21, 2022DISBURSEMENT REQUEST AND COPY OF CHECK
Date: March 21, 2022CERTIFIED MAILING OF CHECK
Date: March 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAILING OF CHECK | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DISBURSEMENT REQUEST AND COPY OF CHECK | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTORNEY | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number 22 2022001259 | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2 IN POSSESSION-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FOR DENNIS STANLEY STOKES-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1 IN POSSESSION-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.