Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Vanderbilt Mortgage And Financ, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by White, Leslie Singleterry, against Florida Housing Finance Corpor, Mages, Deborah, Mages, James, Tenant, Unknown, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ CLERK'S DEFAULT- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: March 10, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 28, 2021SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE- RECORDED CIVIL RECORDED ORB 1200 P 454
Date: March 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTORNEY | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | BIDDER SHEET | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number 21 2021003022 | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF SALE-5/19,5/26 | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL TO JAMES & DEBORAH MAGES-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.