Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Malcom Fulcher And Rebecca Ful, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Webb, Paris Richard, against Universal Property And Casua, represented by Brannon, Paul David, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 05, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Malcolm Fulcher and Rebecca Fulcher against United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs are seeking damages in excess of $30,000, exclusive of court costs, attorney's fees, and interest. The plaintiffs are ...
COMPLAINT/SWORN COMPLAINT (AMENDED) PARIS@INSURANCELAWYERS.ORG
Date: February 19, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED FOR CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER AS RA EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: February 19, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: February 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 3/31/2022 at 1100 AM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS VIA ZOOM-MALCOM FULCHER & REBECCA FULCHER | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATOR'S REPORT | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DFENDANT | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.