Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Citizens Bank Na Fka Rbs Citiz, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Clarfield, Steven Jay, against Anders, Troy, Rogers, Darlene Anders, Unknown Heirs Of The Estate Of, represented by Kite-Powell, Julia Bliton, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: April 16, 2021ISSUED MOTION FOR DEFAULT-EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: April 16, 2021NOTICE OF SALE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER 45-EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: February 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | BIDDER SHEET | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number 22 2022001119 | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FOR NOTICE OF SALE-2/16, 2/23 | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER CLOSING CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.