Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Padgett, B R, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Weisser, Kevin Joshua, against Security First Insurance Compa, represented by Richardson, Steven Kyle, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: May 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL DISCOVERY | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS TO COUNT II PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER/COUNTER DEFENDANT'S, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL STEVEN.RICHARDSON@CSKLEGAL | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Defendant Attorney: Steven K Richardson Assigned to SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.