Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Us Bank Na Etc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sanders, Reena Patel, Vanslette, Jason Michael, against Doe, John, Tillis, Bobby G, Tillis, Wilma E, Vanderbilt Mortgage And Financ, represented by Guerrero, Alvaro Felipe, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT FORECLOSURE@GIBBLAW.COM
Date: September 16, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE BOBBY G TILLIS SERVED
Date: September 24, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE JOHN DOE UNSERVED
Date: September 24, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BOBBY G TILLIS SERVED
Date: September 24, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WILMA E TILLIS SERVED
Date: September 30, 2019NOTICE OF DROPPING CERTAIN PARTIES - JOHN DOE
Date: November 05, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT DEFAULT ISSUED FOR WILMA E TILLIS AND BOBBY G TILLIS
Date: November 05, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT-EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: March 23, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM
Date: April 30, 2021MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT
Date: July 07, 2021NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT
Date: October 07, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: October 14, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM
Date: October 27, 2021BIDDER SHEET
Date: February 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SALE-NO ENVELOPES PROVIDED TO MAIL COPIES
Date: February 09, 2022CERTIFICATE OF TITILE
Date: February 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITILE | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | BIDDER SHEET | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number 22 2022000622 | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE-NO ENVELOPES PROVIDED TO MAIL COPIES | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION-1/19/2022, 01/26/2022 | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE-EMAILED TO ATTORNEY | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.