Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
City Of Chipley, One Star Florida Partners Lp, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Jordan, Kathryn Michelle Blankenship, against Walsh, Caleb, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is filed by the City of Chipley, a municipal corporation in Florida, against Caleb Walsh, as Trustee of Plum Circle Community Trust, and One Star Florida Partners, LP. The complaint seeks to foreclose a code enforcement lien on certain...
COMPLAINT SERVICE@BLANKENSHIPJORDANPA.COM
Date: September 09, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 09, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: September 09, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED FOR CALEB WALSH EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: September 09, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED ONE STAR FLORIDA PARTNERS LP EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: September 09, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AROBINSON@AROBINSONLAWFIRM.COM
Date: October 23, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DRIGGINS@RIGGINSLAWFIRM.COM
Date: October 25, 2019ANSWER/COUNTER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 25, 2019ANSWER/COUNTER
Date: November 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Petitioner Attorney: Assigned to ONE STAR FLORIDA PARTNERS LP | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION DANIALLE RIGGINS LAW FIRM, PA.'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR ONE STAR FLORIDA PARTNERS, LP | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER/COUNTER | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Defendant Attorney: Danialle Riggins Assigned to ONE STAR FLORIDA PARTNERS LP | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DRIGGINS@RIGGINSLAWFIRM | |
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER/COUNTER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.