Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
One Star Florida Partners Lp, Sn Capital Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Anthony, John Albert, against Caleb Walsh As Trustee Foe Plu, City Of Chipley, Plum Circle Community Trust, The City Of Chipley, represented by Jordan, Kathryn Michelle Blankenship, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 21, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a legal action filed by One Star Florida Partners, LP against Plum Circle Community Trust, Caleb Walsh as Trustee for Plum Circle Community Trust, Affordable Housing Investments, LLC, City of Chipley, and any unknown parties claimin...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 21, 2019COMPLAINT DRIGGINS@RIGGINSLAWFIRM.COM
Date: August 21, 2019DESIGNATION OF EMAIL
Date: August 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 3/31/2022 at 1000 AM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CHAPTER 11 TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS BANKRUPTCY CASE | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY HEARING | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CHAPTER 11 TRUSTEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS BANKRUPTCY CASE | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CHAPTER 11 TURSTEE'S AMENDED MOTION TO COMPROMISE CLAIMS OF SN CAPITAL, LLC AND AFFORDABLE HOUSING INVESTMENTS, LLC | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CHAPTER 11 TRUSTEE'S AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING THE SALE OF SUBSTANTIALLY ALL OF DEBTOR'S ASSETS FREE AND CLEAR OF ALL LIENS, CLAIMS AND ECNUMBRANCES PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 363, (II) APPROVING BIDDING AND SALE PROCEDURES, (III) APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NTOICE, (IV) SCHEDULING AUCTION, (V) GRANTING RELATED RELIEF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.