Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Community South Credit Union, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Heckman, Chad Daniel, against Harris, Rebecca J, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
RECORDED AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: February 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL/ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Event Time Changed:HEARING set for 5/18/2020 at 0215 PM in CH with Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COUNSEL TO ATTEND HEARING BY TELEPHONE | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 5/18/2020 at 0115 PM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ATTEND HEARING BY TELEPHONE | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO 77.055, FLORIDA STATUTES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.