Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nall, Cecil G Jr, Nall, Vera, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Smith, Douglas Latta, against Nall, Cecilia A, represented by Dever, Steven Mitchell, Novonglosky, Kristi Miller, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS- JSTEWART@BURKEBLUE.COM
Date: January 27, 2020PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE FOR TRIAL
Date: April 15, 2020MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: August 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 6/28/2021 at 1100 AM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | REPORT FOR MEDIATOR | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Defendant Attorney: STEVEN MITCHELL DEVER Assigned to CECILIA A NALL | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.