Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
White, Edward C, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against 2010 3 Sfr Venture Llc, Prather, Beth Ann, Prather, Charles Alan, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with Timothy A. Register presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy A. Register Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2018 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Nonhomestead Resid $0-50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Edward C. White, Jr. against Charles Alan Prather, Beth Ann Prather, and 2010-3 SFR Venture, LLC in the Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in Washington County, Florida. The plaintiff alle...
ISSUED SUMMONS FOR CHARLES PRATHER-- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: November 21, 2018ISSUED SUMMONS FOR BETH PRATHER-- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: November 21, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 21, 2018COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE
Date: November 21, 2018NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 21, 2018ISSUED SUMMONS FOR 2010-3 SFR VENTURE,LLC-- EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: November 21, 2018NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 30, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT
Date: January 14, 2019OTHER CLERKS AND ATTORNEYS CERTIFICATE NO DEFENSES FILED
Date: January 14, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT NOT ISSUED
Date: January 14, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY
Date: January 14, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED 2010-3 SFR VENTURE SERVED
Date: January 14, 2019DEFAULT ISSUED FOR 2010-3 SFR VENTURE, LLC EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: January 14, 2019ISSUED SUMMONS FOR BETH ANN PRATHER EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: May 01, 2019CLERKS AND ATTORNEYS CERTIFICATE NO DEFENSES FILED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: January 14, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH CHARLES ALAN PRATHER AND BETH ANN PRATHER
Date: April 26, 2019NOTICE OF ACTION EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: April 26, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT
Date: June 12, 2019SUMMONS NOT ISSUED
Date: April 30, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE CHARLES ANLAN PRATHER NONSERVED
Date: May 16, 2019FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED CIVIL
Date: July 11, 2019ISSUED SUMMONS FOR CHARLES ALAN PRATHER EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: May 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY
Date: June 12, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 14, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE BETH ANN PRATHER NONSERVED
Date: May 16, 2019PROOF OF PUBLISH
Date: July 29, 2019MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: May 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: May 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: May 23, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: May 23, 2019MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE HEARING MEMORANDUM OF STATUS
Date: May 23, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT NOT ISSUED
Date: June 12, 2019REQUEST NOT ISSUED
Date: June 12, 2019DEFAULT FOR CHARLES ALAN PRATHER EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 12, 2019CLERK'S AND ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE NO DEFENSES FILED FOR BETH ANN PRATHER
Date: June 12, 2019BIDDER INFORMATION SHEET
Date: August 14, 2019CLERK'S AND ATTORNEY'S CERTIFICATE NO DEFENSES FILED FOR CHARLES ALAN PRATHER
Date: June 12, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: July 29, 2019DEFAULT FOR BETH ANN PRATHER EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: June 12, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SALE- NO COPIES OR ENVELOPES PROVIDED
Date: August 14, 2019NOTICE OF SALE EMAILED TO NEWSPAPER
Date: July 11, 2019CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: August 28, 2019RECORDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Date: August 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 28, 2019 | Docket Event | RECORDED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number 19 19004566 | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | BIDDER INFORMATION SHEET | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE- NO COPIES OR ENVELOPES PROVIDED | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLISH | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED CIVIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.