Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jg Wentworth Originations Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Petitt, Richard Thomas, against Myrick, T, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is an application for court approval of a transfer of structured settlement payment rights. The applicant, J.G. Wentworth Originations, LLC, is seeking approval to buy certain periodic payments from T. Myrick in exchange for a lump sum...
COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 1/7/2019 at 1030 AM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number 18 18006401 | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to JG WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Case 672018CA000127CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/19/2018 | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.