Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dansby, Brandon W, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Powell, Gillis Edward, against Goelz, Terry L, represented by Mcgavock, Kevin Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MANAGEMENT on 5/13/2019 0200 PM Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER results CANCELLED on 4/30/2019 | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ATTEND HEARING TELEPHONICALLY | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ATTEND HEARING TELEPHONICALLY-- PROPOSED ORDER WAS ATTACHED TO THIS MOTION. I CALLED THE ATTY TO LET THEM KNOW THAT THIS WAS ACCEPTED OUT OF ERROR BECAUSE WE CAN NOT ACCEPT PROPOSED ORDERS THROUGH THE E-PORTAL. THE ATTY IS GOING TO CALL/EMAIL P.K. TO SEND HER THE PROPOSED ORDER. 02/27/2019 | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 5/13/2019 at 0200 PM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.