Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Compass Health Brands Corp, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Lindeman, William Mark, against Horizon Health Care Services I, Storfer, Howard, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT
Date: September 05, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT NOT ISSUED
Date: September 05, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT ORDER
Date: November 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DENIED | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF HOWARD STORFER IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | |
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.