Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ruddick, Germaine R, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Williams, Corrections Officer,, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF RUDDICK TO SHOW CAUSE | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO HAVE STAY LIFTED OR MODIFIES | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO HAVE STAY LIFTED OR MODIFIED, EMAILED TO P.K. | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 57.085, FLORIDA STATUTES | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge: REGISTER , TIMOTHY assigned | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Case 672018CA000071CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/4/2018 | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | ACTION FOR FRAUDULENT MISREPRESENTATION OR FRAUDULENT INDUCEMENT, EMAIILED TO PK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.