Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Caliber Home Loans Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rosaler, Brian Lee, against Leisure Lakes Property Owners, Miller, James Jasper, Miller, Tabatha Ann, Unknown Tenants In Possession, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON TABATHA ANN MILLER
Date: June 14, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON LEISURE LAKES PROPERTY OWNER'S ASSOCIATION, INC.
Date: June 14, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT
Date: June 29, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT NOT ISSUED
Date: June 29, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT NOT ISSUED
Date: July 24, 2018ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE
Date: August 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: July 31, 2018MOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONE APPEARANCE
Date: July 31, 2018NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY AND NEWSPAPER
Date: August 30, 2018PROOF OF PUBLISH
Date: September 27, 2018BIDDER SHEET
Date: October 03, 2018CERTIFICATE OF SALE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY
Date: October 03, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FOR TABATHA ANN MILLER-REF:ORDER OF DISMISSAL-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL FOR JAMES JASPER MILLER-REF:ORDER OF DISMISSAL-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN TO SENDER FOR TABITHA A MILLER | |
November 20, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Event LACK OF PROSECUTION scheduled on 1/28/2022 at 0900 AM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE JAMES JASPER MILLER SERVED | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION WMAILED TO ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.