Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Collins, Kimarie, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Goodman, Erika Esan, against Trinity Services Group Inc, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 20, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: May 20, 2018SUMMONS NOT ISSUED
Date: May 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RESOLUTION (PLAINTIFF) | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated Event MOTION HEARING on 8/10/2020 0245 PM Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER results CANCELLED on 8/7/2020 | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF ZOOM HEARING | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 9/24/2020 at 0100 PM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE AND MEMMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.