Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
One South Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Milton, A Clay, against Crossroads Caring Home Llc, Hammack, Aimee M, Hammack, Clifton R, Hammack Contracting Llc, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 26, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT
Date: May 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS NO COPIES PROVIDED OR MAILED OUT | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY NO COPIES PROVIDED | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number 18 18004878 | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | BIDDER SHEET | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLISH | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED EMAILED TO ATTORNEY NO COPIES PROVIDED | |
July 12, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE EMAILED TO ATTONEY AND NEWSPAPER NO COPIES PROVIDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.