Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Herring, Raymond D, filed a(n) Other case represented by Dever, Steven Mitchell, against Duncan, Brandon L, represented by Smallwood Miranda, Christine D, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with Allen L. Register presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllen L. Register Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2018 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: March 28, 2018RETURN OF SERVICE BRANDON L DUNCAN SERVED
Date: April 18, 2018NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: May 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REHEARING/RECONSIDERATION | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 3/1/2021 at 0900 AM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING SUBPOENA POST-JUDGMENT DEPOSITION IN AID OF EXECUTION; PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1.560 | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR REHEARING/RECONSIDERATION | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER AWARDING STATUTORY ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
September 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
September 13, 2020 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS TO DETERMINE COSTS AND FEES AWARDED TO DEFENDANT | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY TIME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.