Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ruddick, Germaine R, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Northwest Florida Reception Ce, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event | RECEIPT TRANSFER - EXECUTED BY LEON COUNTY | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | COVER PAGE, CIRTIFIED COPY OF COMPLETE DOCKET, RECEIPT TRANSFER, CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER FOR TRANSFER, MAILED TO LEON COUNTY VIA US MAIL VIA E-CERTIFIED, E-RETURN RECEIPT 6-13-18 | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | CONFIRMATION OF MAILING TO LEON COUNTY VIA US MAIL, E-CERTIFIED, E- RETURN RECEIPT | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING ORDER DIRECTING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION TO RESPOND AND TRANSFERRING ACTION TO PROPER VENUE | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE ORDER DIRECTING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS TO RESPOND AND TRANSFER VENUE TO THE PROPER VENUE | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS TO RESPOND | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Case 672017CA000130CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/18/2017 | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS EMAILED TO J | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 - ASSESSMENT DELETED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.