Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Regions Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by White, Leslie Singleterry, against Citibank South Dakota Na, Kenneth F Thomas, Unknown Spou, Rita C Thomas, Unknown Spouse, Tenant, Unknown, Thomas, Kenneth F, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS RITA C. THOMAS AKA RITA THOMAS, EMAILED ATTORNEY LWHITE@DEANMEAD.COM
Date: December 15, 2020AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT
Date: February 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ABATE CASE | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDING CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA PENSACOLA DIVISION-ORDER GRANTING THE DEBTOR'S VERFIED MOTION TO EXTEND THE AUTOMATIC STAY | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT-ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO EXTEND OR IMPOSE STAY | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT-NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE STATEMENT HEARING | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | VERIFIED MOTION TO REIMPOSE OR EXTEND THE AUTOMATIC STAY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.