Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Asso, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Diaz, Roy Alan, against Clerk Of Clourt Of Washington, State Of Florida, Unknown Tenant No 1, Unknown Tenant No 2, Williams, Scott T, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT NOT ISSUED
Date: November 17, 2017FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED
Date: February 22, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED
Date: February 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPEN | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $50.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Payment received: $50.00 Receipt Number 18 18001953 | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE VACATE SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISS SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELING FORECLOSURE SALE AND VACATING SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS AND DISMISSING SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLISH | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.