Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Swindle, Joe Ann, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Fielding, Walter Russell, represented by Sloan, Timothy James, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR BY PHONE | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 4/15/2019 at 0300 PM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND MOTION TO DISMISS | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.