Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brock, Kelly, Brock, Marlene, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jordan, Kathryn Michelle Blankenship, against Cook, Paula Gordy, Horton, Michael, Horton, Paige, M And A Supply Company, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT
Date: July 18, 2017MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT NOT ISSUED
Date: September 02, 2017MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT
Date: September 02, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE MAILED OUT | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number 17 17007849 | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | BIDDER SHEET | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE WILL MAIL OUT ON 01/09/17 LIMITED ENVELOPES PROVIDED | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS WILL MAIL OUT ON 01/09/2017 | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $70.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.