Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
First Federal Bank Of Florida, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Milton, A Clay, against Hatacher, Jason D, Hatcher, Ayshia, Panhandle Family Medicine Pa, United States Of America Inter, represented by Smith, Corey J, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: February 21, 2017VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLSOURE CLA
Date: February 21, 2017NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: February 21, 2017SUMMONS NOT ISSUED FOR PANHANDLE FAMILY MEDICINE PA
Date: February 21, 2017SUMMONS NOT ISSUED AYSHIA HATCHER
Date: February 21, 2017SUMMONS NOT ISSUED FOR JASON D HATCHER
Date: February 21, 2017SUMMONS NOT ISSUED UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Date: February 21, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: February 21, 2017SUMMONS FOR AYSHIA HATCHER EMAILED ATTORNEY
Date: February 22, 2017SUMMONS FOR UNITED STATES OF AMERICA EMAILED ATTORNEY
Date: February 22, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED FOR PANHANDLE FAMILY MEDICINE PA EMAILED ATTORNEY
Date: February 22, 2017SUMMONS NOT ISSUED
Date: February 22, 2017SUMMONS FOR JASON D HATCHER EMAILED ATTORNEY
Date: February 22, 2017RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FOR PANHANDLE FAMILY MEDICINE
Date: March 08, 2017RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT --JASON HATCHER
Date: March 08, 2017RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AYSHIA HATCHER
Date: March 08, 2017RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FOR JASON D HATCHER
Date: March 08, 2017RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT--AYSHIA HATCHER
Date: March 08, 2017ANSWER/COUNTER TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY
Date: March 24, 2017CERTIFICATE NOT ISSUED
Date: March 24, 2017CERTIFICATE ISSUED JASON D HATCHER AND AYSHIA HATCHER EMAILED ATTORNEY
Date: March 24, 2017MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT NOT ISSUED
Date: March 24, 2017MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT
Date: March 24, 2017DEFAULT ISSUED FOR JASON D HATCHER AND AYSHIA HATCHER EMAILED ATTORNEY
Date: March 24, 2017AMENDED DEFAULT --SENT TO ATTORNEY
Date: March 27, 2017RETURN OF SERVICE FROM ATTORNEY REGARDING AMENDED DEFAULT
Date: March 27, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: April 13, 2017MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGEMENT OF FORECLOSURE OF FORECLOSURE
Date: April 13, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 25, 2017AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 13, 2017NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL MORTGAGE, NOTE, AGREEMENT
Date: May 18, 2017CERTIFICATE OF SALE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY NO COPIES FURNISHED
Date: June 28, 2017CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Date: June 28, 2017BIDDER SHEET
Date: June 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE EMAILED ATTORNEY NO ENVELOPES PROVIDED | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE EMAILED TO ATTORNEY NO COPIES FURNISHED | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number 17 17004300 | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | BIDDER SHEET | |
June 05, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL MORTGAGE, NOTE, AGREEMENT | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT RECORD IN BOOK 1089 PAGE 81-EMAILED TO ATTORNEY NO ENVELOPES PROVIDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.