Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Modlin, Scott Eric, against Tully, Jason W, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 2/7/2019 at 0100 PM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM PALM BEACH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT RECEIVED ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CASE BEING TRANSFERED TO PALM BEACH COUNTY WITH ORDER | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | BLAKE SMITH WITH PALM BEACH COUNTY CALLED NEEDED CERTIFIED COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET AND EX-PARTE ORDER MAILED TO PO BOX 2906 WEST PALM BEACH FL 33402 | |
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE STATUS SET TO TRANSFER | |
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | TRANSFERRED TO PALM BEACH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT. MAILED OUT DOCUMENTS TO PALM COUNTY CLERK OF COURT | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER EX PARTE ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE TO TRANSFE VENUE | |
April 08, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE UNABLE TO SERVE JASON W TULLY | |
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JASON W TULLY--- NOT FOUND | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE 672017CA000012CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 2/8/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.