Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Collier--# 743297, Quinton, filed a(n) Other Circuit Civil case against Department Of Corrections, Florida Commission On Offender, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with Timothy A. Register presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy A. Register Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2017 |
CategoryOther Circuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO THE PETITIONER'S WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE) | |
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS LIMITED RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | FLORIDA COMMISSION ON OFFENDER REVIEWS RESPONSE TO THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND FLORIDA COMMISSION ON OFFENDER REVIEW TO RESPOND | |
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | FILING BY PETITONER | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGE: REGISTER , TIMOTHY ASSIGNED | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE 672017CA000005CAAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 1/18/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.