Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Triad Of Alabama Llc Dba Flowe, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Steele, Anthony John, against Dailey, Terrie Lee, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by TRIAD OF ALABAMA LLC DBA FLOWERS HOSPITAL against Terrie Dailey in the Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in Washington County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking damages in the amount of $32,213.61, exclusive ...
COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2017SUMMON ISSUED TO TERRIE DAILEY--EMAILED ATTORNEY
Date: January 04, 2017FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED
Date: July 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FOR TERRIE DAILEY ON JUNE 30, 2020 @ 8:24 AM | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED BY CLERK DUCES TECUM IN AID OF EXECUTION | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE STATUS SET TO CLOSED | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | RECORDED--- ORDER AND DISMISSAL | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER SETTLEMENT AGREEEMENT | |
January 16, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ON TERRIE DAILEY | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO TERRIE DAILEY | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.