Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Reid, Mary F, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Stamman, Phillip Thomas, against Eg Retail America Llc, represented by Fretland, Millard Lane, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with GREEN, DAVID WALKER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGREEN, DAVID WALKER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2021RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: May 05, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 09, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 09, 2021PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 14, 2021STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL
Date: August 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COLLATERAL SOURCE INTERROGATORIES | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES -- NOTICE OF COMPLAINCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.