Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Defoor Ventures Llc, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Carter, Jeffrey S., against Walton County Florida, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET;
Date: December 22, 2020PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: December 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PETITIONER TO FILE ITS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO REPLY TO RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT, WALTON COUNTY'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (STEVEN HALL, AS ATTORNEY FOR WALTON COUNTY) | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONDENT'S DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE LEWIS FROM ATTORNEY | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.