Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Coastyle Homes Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Knott, David, Knott, Sherry, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
CIVIL COVER SHEET;
Date: January 09, 2020ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHERRY KNOTT
Date: January 09, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: January 09, 2020STATEMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Date: February 13, 2020NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: January 09, 2020ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO 2019 CIRCUIT COURT
Date: January 09, 2020ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO DAVID KNOTT
Date: January 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED: $10.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 128853 | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 4 ASSESSED AT SUM $10.00 | |
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event | DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS | |
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND MOTION TO DISMISS | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE LEWIS FROM STEPHENS LAW FIRM, P.A., DATED 3/16/20 | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY LIEN SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY LEIN SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.