Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Guevara, Antonio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Montesinos, Marcelo Uriel, against Vermilya, Brian J, Youngs Cargo Inc, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with Jeffrey E. Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey E. Lewis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
CIVIL COVER SHEET;
Date: December 18, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 18, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: February 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SUZANNE D. CHURCH | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF AFFIDAVIT OF SUZANNE CHURCH | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF AFFIDAVIT OF PAMELA ST. JOHN LYNDE | |
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PAMELA S. LYNDE | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FOR PAYMENT OF INTEREST | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FOR PAYMENT OF INTEREST | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $470.00 | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO: YOUNGS CARGO, INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.