Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Harvell, Anna, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Wilkes, Alisa D, against John Doe As Personal Represena, Regions Bank, represented by Sebag, Jessica Tamar, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
COMPLAINT TO QUIET TAX TITLE
Date: December 18, 2019PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM
Date: December 27, 2019REPORT OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM
Date: March 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE ON THE PLEADINGS | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE TO MEREDITH R STEWART ON 4/22/2020 | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MEREDITH R STEWART ON 4/17/2020 | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ON DEFENDANTS REGIIONS BANK; MEREDITH STEWART AND MORGAN RILEY | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MORGAN RILEY ON 4/17/2020 | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE TO MORGAN RILEY ON 4/22/2020 | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED: $20.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 129340 | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $20.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.