Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Us Bank Trust National Associa, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Peck, Christopher Tadeus, against Jz Grayson Llc, L Atrium At Sandestin Assoc In, Tenant 1, Unknown, Tenant 2, Unknown, Turner, Jack V, (total of 8) See All represented by Hogue, Shelley Kaye, Stephens, Jeffrey Michael, Williamson, Andy Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with GREEN, DAVID WALKER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGREEN, DAVID WALKER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2019 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Homestead Resid $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION
Date: April 20, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: October 06, 2020PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: December 17, 2020NOTICE OF FILING
Date: December 17, 2020ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Date: December 23, 2020DEFENDANT TURNER FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 05, 2021DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR MEDIATION
Date: January 05, 2021DEFENDANT TURNER REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 05, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING 2-5-21 AT 1:30 PM CST
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 23, 2020DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: December 23, 2020DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: January 05, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 2-5-21 AT 9:30 AM CST
Date: January 20, 2021AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: January 05, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 2-5-21 AT 1:30 PM CST
Date: January 20, 2021MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SCHEDULED FOR 2-5-21
Date: January 15, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET;
Date: November 25, 2019MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: December 19, 2019VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE
Date: November 25, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: November 25, 2019VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FORM
Date: November 25, 2019CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE
Date: November 25, 2019UNSIGNED SUMMONS J.Z. GRAYSON LLC
Date: November 25, 2019UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO JACK V TURNER
Date: November 25, 2019UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: November 25, 2019UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO L'ATRIUM AT SANDESTIN ASSOCIATION INC
Date: November 25, 2019UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LINDA W TURNER
Date: November 25, 2019UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: November 25, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO: JACK V TURNER A/K/A JACK TURNER
Date: November 26, 2019UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACK V TURNER
Date: November 25, 2019UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO LINDA W TURNER
Date: November 25, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO: J.Z. GRAYSON LLC
Date: November 26, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO: L'ATRIUM AT SANDESTIN ASSOCIATION INC
Date: November 26, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LINDA W TURNER
Date: November 26, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACK V TURNER
Date: November 26, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: November 26, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO: UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: November 26, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO: LINDA W TURNER
Date: November 26, 2019ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: January 03, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LINDA W TURNER 1-6-2020
Date: February 11, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL BY SHELLEY HOGUE
Date: January 10, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JACK V. TURNER A/K/A JACK TURNER ON 1/6/2020
Date: January 14, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO J.Z. GRAYSON LLC 1-25-2020
Date: February 11, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO LINDA W. TURNER A/K/A LINDA TURNER ON 1/6/2020
Date: January 14, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE TO L'ATRIUM AT SANDESTIN ASSOCIATION, INC. ON 12/30/19
Date: January 07, 2020ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER
Date: January 31, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2 1-6-2020
Date: February 11, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1 1-6-2020
Date: February 11, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNSERVED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACK V TURNER 1-6-2020
Date: February 11, 2020ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES BY JACK V TURNER AND LINDA W TURNER
Date: February 18, 2020ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY J.Z. GRAYSON, LLC
Date: February 12, 2020NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES
Date: February 20, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR J.Z. GRAYSON, LLC
Date: February 12, 2020DEFAULT ON L'ATRIUM AT SANDESTIN ASSOCIATION, INC
Date: February 20, 2020MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: February 20, 2020PROPOSED DEFAULT
Date: February 20, 2020MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT
Date: August 24, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING 10-2-20 AT 11:00 AM CST
Date: September 11, 2020PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: February 05, 2021ORDER ON MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT HEARING SET FOR FEBRUARY 5, 2021
Date: January 22, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: January 28, 2021STIPULATED ORDER ON MOTION FOR MEDIATION
Date: January 28, 2021STIPULATED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: January 28, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATED ORDER ON MOTION FOR MEDIATION | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT HEARING SET FOR FEBRUARY 5, 2021 | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR DEFENDANTS TURNER AT HEARNG FOR FEBRUARY 5, 2021 AT 9:30 AM CENTRAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.