Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Johnson, Lester Dc#046695, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Administrator, Health, Centurion Health Care, D.O.C, Secretary, Rice, Walton C.I.K., in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
|
DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELEIF
Date: November 12, 2019PRISONER'S MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COURT COSTS AND FEES
Date: August 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPENED FOR CIVIL OTHER ON 4/26/2021 | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING AS MOOT THE PLAINTIFF'S PRO SE MOTIONS TO RULE | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPEN CIVIL OTHER CLOSED ON 9/29/2021 | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL MOTION TO RULE | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RULE | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $100.00 | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S PRO SE "AMENDED DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF" WITHOUT PREJUDICE AFTER SECTIONS 57.085 REVIEW | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $400.00 | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PRISONER'S INDIGENCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.