Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Crestview Hospital Corporation, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lotane, Troy R, against Golightly, Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with GREEN, DAVID WALKER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGREEN, DAVID WALKER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 15, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
ANSWER FILED BY STEPHEN GOLIGHTLY
Date: January 14, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: April 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER AND DISMISSAL | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED TO STEPHEN GOLIGHTLY 12-27-19 | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF'S HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 5-15-20 AT 11:15 AM CT | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED BY STEPHEN GOLIGHTLY | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 1 ASSESSED AT SUM $410.00 | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED: $410.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 124086 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.