Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Roberts Air Conditioning Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Canales, Francisco Fidel, against Elzey, James, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with GREEN, DAVID WALKER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGREEN, DAVID WALKER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
EXEMPLIFIED COPY ORDER AND JUDGMENT
Date: December 23, 2019MOTION FOR CONTINUNING GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGEMENT
Date: December 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | CONTINUING FINAL GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT (HILTON SANDESTIN BEACH GOLF RESORT AND SPA) | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | REOPEN CIVIL CONT ENFORCEMENT CLOSED ON 7/21/2020 | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | REOPENED FOR CIVIL CONT ENFORCEMENT ON 4/24/2020 | |
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONTINUING FINAL GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT (HILTON SANDESTIN BEACH GOLF RESORT AND SPA) | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT PURSUANT TO SECTION 77.055, F.S. AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST SALARY OR WAGES | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | REOPENED FOR CIVIL MODIFICATION ON 12/30/2019 | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUNING GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGEMENT | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT TO JAMES ELZEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.