Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Feazel, Barry G, Miller, Rachel B, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Garrity, Ryan Owen, against Royal Palms Capital Investment, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
EXHIBIT A
Date: November 04, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: November 04, 2019EXHIBIT D AND E
Date: November 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FINDING RECORD ACTIVITY OCCURED, ORDER DENYING DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION, AND ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WITH NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED - 2/24/2020 | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO ROYAL PALMS CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, LLC C/O SECRETARY OF STATE | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 2 ASSESSED AT SUM $10.00 | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED: $10.00 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 126801 | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED ALIAS SUMMONS ROYAL PALMS CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, LLC C/O SECRETARY OF STATE | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT F | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT A | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.