Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kasper, Kathryn Ishee, against Church Street Village Homeowne, Lvnv Funding Llc, Pike, Joseph D, Pike, Julie Shephard, Possession 1, Unknown Party In, (total of 7) See All represented by Stratton, John Michael, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with David W. Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2019 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Homestead Resid $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: October 31, 2019NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: November 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ASSESSMENT 3 ASSESSED AT SUM $18.50 | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT RECEIVED: $18.50 RECEIPT NUMBER MX 145424 | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISSOLVING LIS PENDENS | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MORATORIUM | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA'S DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER ON DEFENDANT, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA OB BEHALF OF THE INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE TO STUART HAZLETT ON 1/30/20 | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE TO US ATTORNEY FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA ON 1/21/20 | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION- THE DEFUNIAK HERALD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.