Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Weston, Jerome, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Madden, Christopher Lee, Oakey, Wyatt Mattison, against Sanders, John Reed, represented by Anderson, Jane, in the jurisdiction of Walton County, FL, . Walton County, FL Superior Courts with LEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEWIS, JEFFREY EDWARD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 25, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWalton County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BE NOTIFIED OF ALL SURGERIES
Date: April 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF DEATH | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
July 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE AT ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE ON INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE, TOLL OR ABATE PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT, SERVED ON 4-14-21 | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BE NOTIFIED OF ALL SURGERIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.