Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Weaver, Terry, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case against Of Corrections, Florida Depart, Jones, Julie, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with KAREN GEIVERS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKAREN GEIVERS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | MANDATE PER CURIAM DENIED | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD EFILED TO DCA, MAILED COPIES (ON CD) TO ATTORNEYS AND INDEX TO DEF | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF THE COURT LT TO SEND RECORD | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF THE COURT APPL TREATED AS ORD REV BY CERT | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT LETTER FROM DCA | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF THE COURT FILE ORDER BEING APPEALED | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Order DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.