Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fishman, Barry Stuart, against Black, Candese E, Black, Ronald B, The Hammocks Subdivision Prope, Unknown Parties In Possession, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SHELFER, JAMES OLIVER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHELFER, JAMES OLIVER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF SALE 7/13/17 @ 11AM (CLERK MAILED NOS TO NEWPAPER ON 6/7/17)
Date: June 07, 2017CERTIFICATE OF SALE 7/13/17
Date: July 13, 2017PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: July 06, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE 7/13/17 | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | BID SHEET | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 1705144 | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE- GRANTED | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 7/13/17 @ 11AM (CLERK MAILED NOS TO NEWPAPER ON 6/7/17) | |
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Event FORECLOSURE scheduled on 7/13/2017 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge JAMES SHELFER presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.