Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hutchinson, Ashley, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Everett, Tyler B, against Walmart Stores Inc, represented by Paleschic, Dale Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with COOPER, JOHN M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOOPER, JOHN M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLERK NEEDS $18.50 RECORDING FEE) | |
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 2/16/17 @ 4PM (COOPER) | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 2/16/2017 at 0400 PM, MX - Judge JOHN COOPER presiding. | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 2/16/2017 0400 PM Judge JOHN COOPER results DISPOSED on 2/8/2017 | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION 3/21/17 @ 9AM (PLAINTIFF) | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DESPOSITION 1/13/17 @ 2PM | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S 2ND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Order REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 2/16/17 @ 4PM (COOPER) (LEON) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.