Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sheets, Deborah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Billy R Evans Harvesting Inc, Dupiche, Elie, Okee B Inc, represented by Sobel, Jack M, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with COOPER, JOHN M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOOPER, JOHN M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 28, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2016DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: July 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 12/15/2016 1000 AM Judge JOHN COOPER results DISPOSED on 12/15/2016 | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 12/15/16 @ 10AM (COOPER) | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 12/15/2016 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge JOHN COOPER presiding. | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 12/15/16 @ 10AM (COOPER) | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPEAR AT HEARING TELEPHONICALLY (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (DEFENDANT'S ELIE DUPICHE) | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $9.00 | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $9.00 Receipt Number MX 1608357 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.