Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mungen, Robert, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mattox, Marie A, against Wireless Advantage Communicati, represented by Hawk, Matthew Greer, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2016 |
CategoryOther-Discrimination Employment/Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: COOPER , JOHN Assigned | |
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $35.00 | |
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $35.00 Receipt Number MX 1603650 | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Defendant Attorney: Matthew Hawk for to WIRELESS ADVANTAGE COMMUNICATIONS INC | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MATTHEW HAWK | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
April 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Return of Service Served WIRELESS ADVANTAGE COMM. 4/7/16 | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | SIGNED SUMMONS EMAILED TO FIRM FOR WIRELESS ADVANTAGE COMMUNICATIONS, INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.