Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Barnett Building Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Scottsdale Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeBefore Hearing - Other |
Scottsdale Ins Co w/affirm defenses
Date: June 08, 2021by Barnett Building LLC, to stay litigation & compel
Date: June 08, 2021To SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop
Date: April 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | w/prej by Barnett Building LLC Instrument: 2023006013 Book: 8355 Page: 3684 View: 2023006013 | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | no new parties | |
July 24, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | pltf's Motion to Stay,for Protective Order as to Discovery and to Compel Appraisal & Memo of Law *see Order for details | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Scottsdale Ins Co w/affirm defenses | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | by Barnett Building LLC, to stay litigation & compel | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | of Patricia A McLean Esq obo Scottsdale Insurance Company & designation of email | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | To SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY rtn to Ptf's Atty via e service for sop | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Scottsdale Insurance Company | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.