Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sandra M Hernandez, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Lina M Lopez, against Wal Mart Stores East Lp, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryPremises Liability/Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeRemoval To U.S. Dist. Court |
to Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Date: March 26, 2021return of service by Sandra M Hernandez
Date: April 14, 2021to Wal-Mart Stores East LP by Sandra M Hernandez
Date: March 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | count II of pltfs complaint by Wal Mart Stores East LP | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | to US District Court by Wal-Mart Stores East LP Instrument: 2021116993 Book: 8050 Page: 3847 View: 2021116993 | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | by Sandra M Hernandez | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Walmart Stores East LP w/affim defenses | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | (amd) of William H Edwaards obo Wal Mart Stores East LP w/designation | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | William H Edwards Esq obo Wal-Mart Stores East LP w/designation | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | return of service by Sandra M Hernandez | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Wal-Mart Stores East LP | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | To WAL MART STORES EAST LP fwd to pltf's atty by eservice for sop | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | to Wal-Mart Stores East LP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.