Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Efrain Vargas Jr filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Formal |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2022083884 Book: 8234 Page: 4510 View: 2022083884 | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | for Dsc. | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Waiver of Acctg. Rcpt of Benf Cns to Dsc by Erfrain Vargas Jr | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | from Halifax Hospital Medical Center | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | from FL. Power and Light | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | by Halifax Hospital Medical Center for $1,649.26, e-svd. | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | by FL. Power for $67.92, e-svd. | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Ntc. to Creditors 1st pub 09/27/21 | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Ntc. to Creditors w/evidence of delivery | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Efrain Vargas Jr., w/out bond Instrument: 2021218696 Book: 8118 Page: 526 View: 2021218696 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.